pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


2020 Communications Trust
20/20 Trust
CC24748
9429043028337
Registered

Registration details

22/05/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 20020
Newtown
Wellington
6242
2 Woodward Street
32 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04) 479 8636


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide leadership and work with communities to deliver programmes that contribute to New Zealanders’ digital literacy, skills and inclusion. The 20/20 Trust addresses issues resulting from the increasing use of information and communication technologies (ICTs), initiating, proving and delivering community based solutions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides leadership and a range of programmes that seek to ensure all New Zealanders can participate in the digital world.)

Community development

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The Trust is governed by a Board that sets strategic direction. Operations are managed by an Executive Director and delivery is made by a national team of managers, staff, contractors and delivery partners.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 4/12/2018 $1,884,506 $2,041,112
31/12/2017 7/12/2017 $4,470,628 $4,451,581
31/12/2016 28/12/2016 $4,150,397 $4,264,200
31/12/2015 31/12/2015 $4,064,333 $4,080,703
31/12/2014 20/10/2014 $3,772,011 $3,765,728
31/12/2013 9/12/2013 $3,799,494 $3,786,102
31/12/2012 15/11/2012 $3,312,448 $3,273,034
31/12/2011 12/02/2012 $2,887,974 $2,854,745
31/12/2010 15/01/2011 $1,385,192 $1,427,229
31/12/2009 24/12/2009 $1,114,609 $1,179,406

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Catherine Cotter Trustee 23/05/2017
Angela Lim Trustee 21/12/2015
Angela Hauk-Willis Trustee 6/06/2013
Selwyn Screen Treasurer 3/11/2011
David Barrow Trustee 15/11/2010
Laurence John Millar Trustee 20/10/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sarah Bacon Trustee 27/03/2018
Alaelua Malesala Trustee 8/12/2017
Michael Howden Trustee 23/05/2017
Kim Humpherson Trustee 30/11/2016
Precious Clark Trustee 30/06/2016
Barbara Craig Trustee 1/12/2015
Andrew Annakin Trustee 17/03/2015
Hazel Jennings Trustee 6/10/2014
Kath Norton Trustee 17/10/2013
Piripi Kenneth Moore Trustee 17/10/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/12/2015 NOC010
23/03/2015 NOC009
9/12/2013 NOC008
15/11/2012 NOC005
12/02/2012 AR004
15/01/2011 AR003
24/12/2009 AR002
18/11/2009 NOC004
25/08/2009 NOC003
28/03/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents