pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ngai Tahu Aquaculture Services Limited
CC52562
9429041932681
Registered

Registration details

19/08/2015
June 30

Address for service

15 Show Place
Addington
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details



Group Members


Below are all the members of Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
CNI Tourism Limited
Dart River Safaris Limited
Glacier Southern Lakes Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Hoaka Limited
Hollyford Valley Walk Limited
Hukafalls Jet Limited
MWD Helicopters Limited
Ngai Tahu Aquaculture Services Limited
Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Refer to the constitution

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(All profits applied to Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust)

Other (please state)

(All profits applied to Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust)

Other (please state)

(Nga Tahu Charitable Trust)

Entity Structure

Corporate trustee for charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Benjamin Gurney Sullivan Bateman Officer 21/09/2017
Jennifer Marie Crawford Officer 21/09/2017
Craig Ellison Officer 1/10/2015
Richard Janes Officer 1/10/2015
Maria Hinewai Pera Officer 18/08/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gregory Mark Summerton Officer 6/11/2018
Robert Frederick Pooley Director 31/07/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/11/2018 NOC006
25/09/2017 NOC003
9/08/2017 NOC002

Charity Documents