pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Aglow International - New Zealand Incorporated
CC11133
Registered

Registration details

17/09/2007
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 30513
Lower Hutt
5040
191 High Street
Hutt Central
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

(04)568 9653

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Aglow as a Christian organisation that goes right across the denominations, provides a platform to establish and enhance leadership qualities in both the business and community environments. Aglow reinforce that leaders need to remember with authority comes accountability and with position comes responsibility. Aglow provides opportunities for women and men to participate in team building activities, learn sustainable conflict resolution skills and manage healthy relationships. Aglow supports and encourages a high degree of wisdom and sensitivity when relating to all cultures.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Other (please state)

(Women), Family / whanau

Entity Structure

International Board of Directors, USA Aglow Global Headquarters USA South Pacific Regional Committee, Australia Aglow International New Zealand Inc - National Board National Field Representatives - different regions Through out NZ Local Presidents and boards Local Members

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2017 14/09/2017 $105,918 $98,227
30/09/2016 17/08/2016 $118,289 $115,985
30/09/2015 15/09/2015 $146,793 $153,960
30/09/2014 27/08/2014 $44,152 $41,119
30/09/2013 18/09/2013 $115,730 $110,993
30/09/2012 29/08/2012 $72,008 $58,417
30/09/2011 25/10/2011 $92,730 $99,484
30/09/2010 14/07/2010 $112,571 $111,929
30/09/2009 17/11/2009 $71,685 $106,884

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Julie Ann Thomson Treasurer 5/02/2017
Margaret Hewlett VP Affiliations/Membership 17/08/2013
Glenda June Farr VP Administration 23/02/2013
Jeanette Mary Ward President 7/12/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Linda Whitchelo Treasurer 31/05/2016
Julie Thomson VP Administration 31/03/2016
Judith Kay Monastra Affilations Officer 1/06/2013
Mary Bowling Legal Business Officer 1/06/2013
Judy Monastra - 1/12/2012
Joy Carol Fortuin President 7/12/2010
Judith Kay Monastra - 31/05/2010
Katie Lynnaire Davies Generations project Coordinator 30/12/2009
Cynthia Johnson Secretary 17/11/2009
Glenda Farr Treasurer 9/09/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/12/2015 NOC010
28/08/2014 NOC009
21/05/2013 NOC004
28/08/2012 AR006
25/10/2011 AR005
9/03/2011 NOC003
14/07/2010 AR004
17/11/2009 AR003
10/09/2008 AR002
11/02/2008 NOC003

Charity Documents