pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Operations Research Society of New Zealand Incorporated
ORSNZ
CC40246
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 6544
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
C/O DEPT OF ENGINEERING SCIENCE LEVEL 3
70 Symonds Street
Grafton
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the Society are the advancement of education through encouraging the extending the knowledge and use of Operations Research techiques by: - Holding meeting for the purpose of reading papers and discussing Operations Research subjects. - Publishing papers of Operations Research. - Encouraging the formation of branches where appropriate. - Such other methods as the Council shall from time to time determine.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Organises research conferences, distributes newsletters and awards student prizes to further education in Operational Research

Education / training / research

General public

Students, Academics, Practitioners and those members of the General Public interested in Operational Research in NZ

Entity Structure

The council shall consist of a President, a Vice-President, an Honorary Secretary, an Honorary Treasurer, and six other members. In addition, not more than five members may be co-opted annually by the Council.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 10/01/2018 $2,664 $32,082
31/12/2016 4/04/2017 $38,548 $2,476
31/12/2015 17/03/2017 $6,036 $2,717
31/12/2014 17/03/2017 $62,853 $63,269
31/12/2013 21/11/2013 $21,517 $20,713
31/12/2012 18/12/2012 $6,427 $6,227
31/12/2011 13/12/2011 $30,803 $18,414
31/12/2010 7/12/2010 $13,591 $14,937
31/12/2009 18/11/2009 $20,675 $17,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael O'Sullivan President 1/04/2017
Rachael Tappenden Canterbury Regional Contact 11/01/2017
Anthony Downward Secretary 1/12/2015
Cameron Walker Auckland Regional Contact 1/12/2013
Kim Frew Council Member 1/12/2013
Kevin Ross Council Member 1/12/2012
Geoffrey Pritchard Vice President 30/11/2010
Andrea Raith Treasurer 3/12/2009
Grant Read Council Member 30/11/2008
Andy Bryan Philpott Council Member 30/11/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hector Fernando Beltran-garcia Council Member 1/12/2016
Mark Richard Johnston Council Member 1/12/2014
David Murray Ryan Council Member 1/12/2013
Ross Jonathon William James Council Member 1/12/2013
Stefanka Stefanova Chukova Council Member 1/12/2013
Alastair John Mcnaughton Council Member 1/12/2012
Matthias Ehrgott Vice President 1/12/2012
Ken Kuhn Newsletter Editor 1/12/2011
Shane Dye Council Member 4/12/2009
Hamish Alfred Richard Waterer Secretary 30/11/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/01/2018 NOC009
4/04/2017 NOC007
3/04/2017 NOC006
3/04/2017 NOC005
17/03/2017 NOC004
7/12/2010 AR003
18/11/2009 AR002

Charity Documents