pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hokianga Health Enterprise Trust
Hauora Hokianga / Hokianga Health
CC11039
9429042646037
Registered

Registration details

6/09/2007
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 753
Kaikohe
0440
163 Parnell Street
Rawene 0473
Rawene
Rawene
0473

Charity's other details

(09)4057322
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/hokiangahealth/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide primary healthcare for residents of Hokianga.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Education / training / research, Economic development

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We are charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 18/11/2020 $11,838,074 $11,741,815
31/12/2019 13/10/2019 $11,070,952 $11,168,580
31/12/2018 13/11/2018 $10,701,097 $10,888,063
31/12/2017 3/10/2017 $10,189,198 $9,872,785
31/12/2016 23/11/2016 $10,621,298 $10,155,591
31/12/2015 18/11/2015 $10,158,167 $10,150,777
31/12/2014 26/01/2015 $9,922,485 $9,660,883
31/12/2013 22/11/2013 $9,402,695 $9,813,309
31/12/2012 21/01/2013 $9,360,335 $9,394,655
31/12/2011 17/11/2011 $9,389,706 $9,381,018

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Margareth Broodkoorn CEO 25/01/2021
Hiku Cherrington Trustee 19/11/2020
Jessie McVeagh Trustee 19/11/2020
Kathrine Clarke Trustee 1/12/2019
Norah Clausen Trustee 1/12/2019
David Clive Mules Trustee 18/12/2018
Betty Harris Trustee 1/11/2018
Elisabeth Bowker Trustee 1/11/2018
Elizabrth Warr Trustee 1/11/2018
Marara Rogers Trustee 1/11/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Wigglesworth Secretary/Treasurer 25/01/2021
Gwen Freese Trustee 24/11/2020
Moriana Wynyard Trustee 1/11/2020
Elizabeth Joan Waipouri Trustee 1/03/2020
Cheryl Turner Trustee 1/12/2019
Francis Hau Trustee 1/12/2019
Hohipere Areaiiti Trustee 1/12/2019
Carla Gene Robinson Trustee 31/10/2018
Francis Lewis Howard Trustee 31/10/2018
Gina Albert Trustee 31/10/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/01/2021 NOC029
27/01/2021 NOC028
27/01/2021 NOC027
27/01/2021 NOC026
2/03/2020 NOC024
19/12/2019 NOC023
13/12/2019 NOC022
19/12/2018 NOC020
13/11/2018 NOC018
13/11/2018 NOC017

Charity Documents