pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Four Winds Wellness/Nga Hau e Wha (Pukenga) Charitable Trust
CC50826
N/A
Deregistered
18/07/2017
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Four Winds Wellness/Nga Hau e Wha (Pukenga) Charitable Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

10/06/2014
June 30
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 18/07/2017 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 10/06/2014

Address for service

5 Arataua Street
Ohinemutu
Rotorua
3010

Charity's other details

07 348 1425


Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Health

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, International activities, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2016 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2015 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2014 9/04/2015 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Annette Sue Baca Executive Officer 7/06/2014
John Baca Chairperson 7/06/2014
Karla Rimupai Kereopa Executive Officer 7/06/2014
Ranui Porter Executive Officer 7/06/2014

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents