pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Heart Kids New Zealand Incorporated
Heart Kids
CC20102
9429042696902
Registered

Registration details

22/11/2007
November 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Heart Children New Zealand Incorporated 23/11/2007
@Heart Incorporated 21/12/2010
Heart Kids New Zealand Incorporated 26/05/2014

Address for service

PO Box 108034
Symonds Street
Auckland
1150
C/- MTM Accounting
Level 3, 191 Thorndon Quay
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0800543943


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Heart Kids seeks to provide lifelong support to all those affected by Congenital Heart Defects. We understand that Heart Children may need help and support not only during their early years, but throughout their lives The purposes of Heart Kids are: (a)To support Heart Children and their Whanau. (b)To give practical and financial support to Heart Children and their Parents. (c)To educate Heart Children and their Whanau about CHD and the support available to them. (d)To educate the public about the needs of Heart Children and their Whanau. (e)To fund equipment for Heart Children. (f)To provide representational advocacy for Heart Children and their Whanau. (g)To carry on any other charitable purpose which may seem to Heart Kids capable of being conveniently carried on by Heart Kids. Heart Kids' purposes are exclusively charitable, except insofar as Heart Kids may undertake, in order to achieve its charitable purposes, activities that are ancillary to its charitable purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Fund-raising, Disability - Support of Children with Heart Defects

Children / young people

People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

A national organisation which has 11 affiliated local branches throughout New Zealand.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 May 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 May 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2021 27/08/2021 $3,003,190 $2,811,659
31/08/2020 18/08/2020 $3,283,223 $3,129,336
31/05/2019 Member of 'Heart Children New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/05/2018 Member of 'Heart Children New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/05/2017 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/05/2016 9/04/2016 $2,150,141 $2,017,679
31/05/2015 26/05/2015 $1,401,931 $1,432,548
31/05/2014 26/05/2014 $1,338,393 $1,334,822
31/05/2013 31/05/2013 $1,390,303 $1,249,825
31/05/2012 31/05/2012 $1,331,168 $1,333,161

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rebecca Margaret Horgan Board Member 29/05/2021
Robyn Kaye Wickenden Board Member 29/05/2021
Kelly Irene Douglas Board Member 1/06/2020
Bryan Andrew McEwen Board Member 31/05/2018
Donna Maria Jujnovich Board Member 26/05/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alexander James Wilson Board Member 29/05/2021
Emma Margaret Olphert Lawler Board Member 29/05/2021
Melissa Lee Broomhall Board Member 29/05/2021
Ross Leonidas Blackler Board Member 29/05/2021
Thomas Iain Abercrombie Board Member 24/08/2020
Kate Figgins CEO 4/05/2020
Mark Phillips Board Member 4/05/2020
Graeme Mann Board Member 18/01/2019
Robert Lutter CEO 4/01/2019
Bruce Montgomery Board Member 12/02/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/07/2021 NOC032
26/06/2021 NOC029
30/07/2020 NOC026
30/07/2020 NOC024
25/01/2019 NOC022
18/05/2018 NOC020
30/05/2017 NOC018
3/10/2016 NOC016
27/05/2016 NOC014
26/05/2015 NOC013

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC20103) on 5 June 2019.