pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Waikato City Assembly of God Trust Board
Freedom Christian Church
CC22461
9429043045853
Registered

Registration details

2/04/2008
March 31

Address for service

34 East Street
Claudelands
Hamilton
3214
3 Clow Place
Melville
Hamilton
3206

Charity's other details

(07)8533000
Facebook icon image
facebook.com/freedomchristianchurchaog


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Freedom Christian Church exists to promote the Gospel standards and values within Hamilton. This includes providing support and community in a multi-generational environment.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Freedom Christian Church is controlled by a Trust Board elected by its members. The Trust Board is responsible for all financial and governmental issues. A leadership committee exists under the Board to control day to day running of the Church.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 24/08/2018 $253,115 $256,463
30/09/2017 31/07/2017 $271,392 $262,322
30/09/2016 2/03/2017 $226,720 $232,262
30/09/2015 11/06/2015 $232,305 $224,799
30/09/2014 6/05/2014 $526,779 $579,461
30/09/2013 3/06/2013 $160,181 $133,707
30/09/2012 14/08/2012 $135,057 $127,686
30/09/2011 22/09/2011 $112,072 $117,178
30/09/2010 18/11/2010 $106,144 $99,019
30/09/2009 16/09/2009 $112,080 $129,452

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dennis Clement Board Member 24/08/2018
Venkataramani Govindasamy Board member 15/07/2018
Jean Woolston Board Member 22/06/2014
Uday Siddapur Board Member 22/06/2014
Ray Moxham Chairman - Senior Pastor 3/04/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ian Anderson Board Member 31/03/2018
Paul Goslett Board Member 31/03/2018
Peter Brown Board Member 22/06/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/06/2014 NOC005
14/08/2012 AR005
22/09/2011 AR004

Charity Documents