pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand China Friendship Society Incorporated
NZCFS
CC24101
9429042707998
Registered

Registration details

8/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

202 Mandeno Street
Te Awamutu
3800

Charity's other details

0221283215

Asia

China


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote friendship and understanding between the people's of New Zealand and China.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Arts / culture / heritage, International activities, Economic development, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The NZCFS is a national organisation managed by a National Executive who are elected via the wider membership.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 13/01/2021 $115,175 $132,525
30/09/2019 12/01/2021 $152,281 $144,529
30/09/2018 11/07/2019 $221,116 $273,548
30/09/2017 8/01/2018 $112,985 $106,765
30/09/2016 4/01/2018 $120,204 $169,319
30/09/2015 29/10/2015 $206,202 $214,851
30/09/2014 21/11/2014 $154,675 $121,438
30/09/2013 30/12/2013 $300,924 $229,782
30/09/2012 19/07/2012 $298,737 $378,813
30/09/2011 15/09/2011 $437,676 $283,713

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dave Adamson National Secretary 21/08/2021
Christopher Lipscombe Central Vice President 23/05/2021
Kelly Li National Executive 23/05/2021
Kylie Meredith National Treasurer 10/10/2020
Mark Price National Executive 16/05/2020
Djany Tanabe National Executive 26/05/2019
Miao Fan Northern Vice-President 26/05/2019
Vivien Qin National Executive 26/05/2019
Dave Adamson National Executive Member 26/05/2013
David Bromwich National President 26/05/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Craig James Ashby South Island Vice President 23/05/2021
Craig James Ashby National Secretary 23/05/2021
Heiko Lade Central Vice President 23/05/2021
John Hodgson National Executive 23/05/2021
Christine James Ward National Executive 13/01/2021
Christine Ward National Executive 16/05/2020
George Andrews Vice President (North Island Northern) 16/05/2020
Ian Ross Lister National Treasurer 16/05/2020
Simon Appleton National Secretary 16/05/2020
Chris Goodwin Vice President (Southern) 26/05/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/04/2021 NOC020
25/02/2021 NOC019
24/02/2021 NOC018
15/06/2014 NOC010
4/06/2013 NOC004
31/05/2013 NOC003
29/05/2013 NOC002
28/07/2012 NOC001
19/07/2012 AR005
15/09/2011 AR004

Charity Documents