pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Health Trust
NZHT
CC38604
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 79266
Avonhead
Christchurch
8446
36 Birmingham Drive
Middleton
Christchurch
8024

Charity's other details

021347370


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To commission research into health issues and to acquire information in relation to health conditions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $75,015 $44,537
30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $200,045 $213,837
30/09/2018 14/09/2018 $290,044 $284,100
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $500,057 $507,651
30/09/2016 11/10/2016 $320,202 $339,123
30/09/2015 15/09/2015 $190,233 $211,907
30/09/2014 27/08/2014 $250,109 $265,653
30/09/2013 24/09/2013 $212,089 $149,800
30/09/2012 4/09/2012 $12,883 $62,766
30/09/2011 1/11/2011 $113,229 $92,884

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
New Zealand Health Limited Trustee 13/08/2002

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents