pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Foundation for the Dunedin Civic Orchestra
DSO Foundation
CC22696
9429042853909
Registered

Registration details

8/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 5571
Moray Place
Dunedin
9058
65 Hanover Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

03 4775623


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Makes grants to organisations (including other charities), undertakes fund-raising in the cultural sector, with the general public and young people being the main beneficiaries.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

Arts / culture / heritage

Other charities

Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

The Foundation is an incorporated society with provision for up to six Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/04/2018 27/05/2018 $1,682 $750
30/04/2018 30/04/2018 $2,828 $3,250
31/12/2015 24/12/2015 $6,968 $750
31/12/2014 24/12/2014 $6,996 $3,250
31/12/2013 12/12/2013 $15,336 $750
31/12/2012 18/12/2012 $6,793 $750
31/12/2011 15/12/2011 $14,505 $750
31/12/2010 28/06/2011 $14,244 $0
31/12/2009 7/01/2010 $12,062 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brendan James Gray Chair 13/03/2017
Andrew George Alastair Hamilton Treasurer 2/03/2016
Neville Peat Vice-Chairman 7/07/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Timothy Morris Black Trustee 1/03/2016
Bevan Richard Neale Dodds Trustee 6/03/2014
Paul Orders Trustee 1/12/2013
Henry Mabley Johnson Trustee 30/06/2010
Margaret Dorothy MacKenzie Trustee 30/06/2010
Philip James Harland Trustee 30/06/2010
Philippa Mary Maude Harris Trustee 30/06/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/12/2013 NOC005
18/12/2012 AR005
15/12/2011 AR004

Charity Documents