pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Hororata Community Trust
CC46824
N/A
Registered

Registration details

31/07/2011
March 31

Address for service

C/- DUNCAN COTTERILL
PO Box 5
Christchurch
8140
148 Victoria Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To apply the capital and income of the Trust to assist and maintain the repair, rebuild and restoration of buildings, structures, facilities and places in and around Hororata. To establish or provide or assist with the establishment or provision of new buildings, structures, and facilities to benefit the local Hororata and wider community. To provide or implement or assist in the provision or implementation of services intended to benefit the local Hororata or wider community. To benefit, serve and meet the needs of the local Hororata community generally.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Environment / conservation, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Trust will be administered by the Board which will be comprised initially of the First Trustees together with any other Trustees who are appointed and hold office as Trustees from time to time.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
23/12/2019 31/10/2019 $353,088 $313,449
31/12/2018 21/12/2018 $221,654 $186,812
30/09/2017 7/11/2017 $186,391 $159,658
30/09/2016 11/10/2016 $191,640 $155,608
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $147,665 $148,335
30/09/2014 29/09/2014 $208,983 $130,069
30/09/2013 27/09/2013 $227,310 $216,150
30/09/2012 28/09/2012 $198,735 $108,351

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrew Blair Hastie Trustee 5/09/2019
Diana Margaret Innes Trustee 4/05/2016
Ainsley Gael Walter Trustee 22/10/2014
Mark James Stewart Trustee 24/03/2011
Olive Jean Webb Trustee 24/03/2011
Richard Stirling Thomson Lang Trustee 24/03/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/09/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents