pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


City Mission Palmerston North
CC32576
9429042575191
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Anglican Social Work Trust (Pamerston North) 30/06/2008
City Mission Palmerston North 8/03/2019

Address for service

PO Box 549
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North
4440
338 Church Street
Palmerston North 4410
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

06 355 1204


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide for the mental and social wellbeing of seniors and thereby prevent social isolation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Health, Arts / culture / heritage

Older people

People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

A board consisting of a chairperson and a minimum of 5 trustees and a maximum of 7 trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2019 16/07/2019 $77,113 $78,561
30/06/2018 28/03/2018 $85,752 $69,810
30/06/2017 17/05/2017 $65,809 $70,965
30/06/2016 30/03/2016 $79,929 $69,477
30/06/2015 20/04/2015 $59,355 $75,189
30/06/2014 23/05/2014 $71,241 $70,685
30/06/2013 21/05/2013 $54,068 $71,509
30/06/2012 30/04/2012 $103,888 $96,295
30/06/2011 23/05/2011 $59,564 $60,111
30/06/2010 21/07/2010 $61,473 $64,430

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrew Murray Carson Chairman 15/11/2018
Jennifer Barclay Watson Trustee 2/10/2018
Bruce Parsons Trustee 30/09/2005
Graeme Duncan Trustee 30/09/2005
Lesley Mitchell Trustee 20/09/1997

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jenny Barclay Watson Trustee 1/10/2018
Jill Knowles Trustee 1/10/2018
Alan Parkes Board Member 28/02/2014
Jean King Trustee 30/06/2012
Russell Lyon Trustee 1/03/2011
Marean Annette Jebson Trustee 1/08/2010
Joy Crozier Trustee 1/07/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/05/2019 NOC015
13/03/2019 NOC014
28/11/2018 NOC013
6/11/2018 NOC012
5/05/2016 NOC008
3/03/2014 NOC007
21/05/2013 AR006
3/06/2011 NOC002
23/05/2011 AR004
21/07/2010 AR003

Charity Documents