Use this to find information about a particular charity.
Charity Summary
Charity Details
Deregistration details
Financial information at the time of Deregistration:
The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:
-
Distributed to another registered Charity or Charities
Charity/Charities:
-
Transferred to another Organisation that is not a registered Charity
Organisation:
Invercargill City Council (community wellbeing fund) $43,091.26 was transferred on 30/06/2022
Below are details of Invercargill Community Recreation and Sports Trust at the date of deregistration:
Registration details
Registration history
Registration Action | Date effective | Deregistration Reason |
---|---|---|
De-registered | 29/06/2022 | The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up) |
Registered | 30/06/2008 |
Address for service
Charity's other details
Organisation with a focus on the following communities:
Purpose & Structure
Charitable Purpose
Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.
Makes grants / loans to individuals
Community development, Arts / culture / heritage
Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees
Entity Structure
Annual Returns
Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.
Exemptions
This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.
Officer Details
Officers
Past Officers
Charity Updates
Charity Documents
Date Uploaded | Document Type | Reference Name |
---|
No supporting documents.