pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
WOA
CC29322
9429042916093
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 1142
Wellington
6140
4 Rangatira Road
Tawa
Wellington
5028

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/ostomynzwellington/


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ostomy Societies Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Federation of New Zealand Ostomy Societies (Inc)
Hawkes Bay Ostomy Support Group Incorporated
Manawatu Ostomy Society
North Harbour Ostomy Society
Otago Ostomy Society Incorporated
Taranaki Ostomy Society
Waikato Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wanganui Ostomy Society Incorporated
Wellington Ostomy Association Incorporated
Western Bay of Plenty Ostomy Society Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide peer support for ostomates, before and after surgery, and to promote their general welfare

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Education / training / research, People with disabilities

Other (please state)

(Ostomates of all ages), Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Members elect a committee, which includes President, Treasurer and Secretary and up to seven committee members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2020 9/04/2020 $1,977 $4,187
30/06/2019 26/05/2019 $2,040 $4,534
30/06/2018 16/06/2018 $2,480 $4,781
30/06/2017 29/04/2017 $3,069 $4,790
30/06/2016 12/05/2016 $4,194 $6,843
30/06/2015 28/05/2015 $5,371 $8,267
30/06/2014 16/06/2014 $6,353 $6,369
30/06/2013 16/06/2013 $5,566 $7,028
30/06/2012 24/06/2012 $5,803 $6,472

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Restricted

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/05/2019 NOC019
16/06/2018 NOC017
22/08/2017 NOC016
18/05/2017 NOC015
8/06/2015 NOC013
28/05/2015 NOC012
2/09/2014 NOC011
16/06/2014 NOC010
16/06/2013 NOC005
1/06/2013 NOC004

Charity Documents