pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Harkness Fellowships Trust (Incorporated)
CC27704
9429042977414
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
September 30

Address for service

PO Box 10387
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
31 Bidwill Street
120 Featherston Street
Mount Cook
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

027 548 0153


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The principal purpose of the Trust is to encourage and promote education and research in New Zealand on public policy issues by enabling outstanding New Zealand mid-career professionals to undertake fellowship programmes in the USA.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust comprises a Board of five Trustees who oversee the governance of the Trust. Trust depends on the support of Trustees and adminstrative providers to achieve its responsibilities and deliver against the Trust's objectives. The Trustees are appointed from among the Harkness Fellowship Alumni.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2021 14/04/2021 $214,017 $51,677
31/03/2020 22/04/2020 $82,022 $98,465
31/03/2019 30/01/2019 $63,215 $63,736
31/03/2018 28/01/2019 $56,365 $62,121
31/03/2017 28/01/2019 $43,611 $63,005
31/03/2016 30/03/2016 $85,077 $18,174
31/03/2015 22/03/2015 $2,040,329 $3,564
31/03/2014 12/03/2014 $1,551 $21,375
31/03/2013 11/03/2013 $2,223 $21,375
31/03/2012 22/03/2012 $3,381 $21,625

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Roger Blakeley Trustee 1/10/2020
Patrick Smellie Trustee 1/11/2017
Aphra Green Trustee 1/11/2016
John Boshier Trustee 25/11/2014
Peter Griffin Trustee 5/06/2014
Ross Tanner Trustee 21/11/2001

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Roger Blakely Trustee 30/09/2020
Jo Brosnahan Trustee 30/09/2019
Bryce Wilkinson Trustee 1/11/2017
Kay Harrison Trustee 1/11/2017
Richard Faull Trustee 1/11/2017
Neville Trendle Trustee 1/06/2017
Peter Douglas Trustee 1/11/2015
Margot Mclean Trustee 11/09/2015
Cynthia Farquhar Trustee 11/08/2015
Mele Wendt Trustee 31/10/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/09/2015 NOC008
1/04/2015 NOC007
21/03/2014 NOC006
4/04/2012 NOC003
2/04/2012 NOC002
22/03/2012 AR004
28/07/2011 AR003
24/02/2010 AR002

Charity Documents