Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary

Charity Details

Friends of the Auckland Art Gallery Incorporated

Registration details

March 31

Address for service

Auckland Art Gallery
Cnr Kitchener & Wellesley Streets
PO Box 5449
Wellesley Street

Charity's other details

Purpose & Structure

Charitable Purpose

A society of members who support the interests of the Auckland Art Gallery.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Fund-raising

Other (please state)

(Auckland Art Gallery), Children / young people, Other charities, General public

Entity Structure

An incorporated society formed on the 2 December 1954. Operating from within the Auckland Art Gallery as a art gallery support organisation to encourage activities within the gallery. The society comprises a president, treasurer and committee.

Annual Returns

Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2017 23/11/2017 $391,293 $378,445
30/09/2016 28/10/2016 $45,578 $55,392
30/09/2015 31/08/2015 $52,151 $51,033

Officer Details


Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mary-Joy Simpson Committee member 15/05/2017
Christiane Pracht Committee member 1/05/2017
Craig Rhett Goodall Committee member 1/05/2017
Graeme Edward Conning Treasurer 1/05/2017
Susan Leigh Sinclair Committee member 1/05/2017
Andrew Green President 31/07/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Raymond Scott President 1/05/2017
Catherine West-Newman Past-President 25/10/2016
Jennifer Hillas Committee Member 25/10/2016
Lynda Agnew Committee Member 25/10/2016
Robert Cox Committee Member 25/10/2016
Marica McEwan Coordinator 31/03/2016
Lynne Browning Committee Member 12/12/2015
Susan Hall Treasurer 21/07/2015
Ann Weatherston Committee Member 29/07/2014
Jennifer Reid Committee Member 29/07/2014

Charity Updates

Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/05/2017 NOC008
15/05/2017 NOC007
30/11/2016 NOC006
24/11/2016 NOC005
3/11/2016 NOC004
17/04/2016 NOC002
31/08/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents