pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Saving the Wild New Zealand
Saving the Wild
CC52014
N/A
Registered

Registration details

29/06/2015
June 30

Address for service

9a Ascot Road
Mount Maunganui
3116

Charity's other details


Africa

Botswana, Kenya, Malawi, Mozambique, Namibia, South Africa, Swaziland, Tanzania, Zambia, Zimbabwe

Asia

Burma (Myanmar), China, Sri Lanka, Thailand, Vietnam


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Dismantle Elephant and Rhino poaching syndicates, expose and eradicate corruption, tackle the poverty link to the poaching crisis. Protect the Rhino and Elephant Tusk gene pool Activities: Provides advice / information / advocacy Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers) Sectors: Care / protection of animals Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, International activities, Economic development. Beneficiaries: Animals People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public Saving the Wild is the main benefactor for SsangYong New Zealand's RHINO vehicle. The charity is promoted through TV campaigns, billboards and through events across New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, International activities, Economic development

Animals

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust - three trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 30/12/2019 $216,238 $242,858
31/12/2018 16/12/2018 $186,158 $189,459
31/12/2017 7/12/2017 $89,283 $45,582
31/12/2016 3/09/2017 $67,258 $13,459

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Simon Lucas Trustee 30/06/2019
Elliot Blade Trustee 18/03/2015
Jamie Joseph Trustee 18/03/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Samuel Moore Trustee 5/08/2019
Taryn Joseph Trustee 25/10/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/08/2019 NOC008
2/09/2018 NOC006
23/08/2018 NOC005
11/12/2017 NOC004
21/10/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents