pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Koginka Sewaluna Foundation Aotearoa
Koginka Sewaluna Foundation
CC51192
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Aoraki Sewaluna Foundation 23/12/2014
Koginka Sewaluna Foundation Aotearoa 6/10/2017

Registration details

23/12/2014
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 556
Shortland Street
Auckland
1140
18 Mahakirau Road
Manaia 3581
Manaia
Coromandel
3581

Charity's other details

027 4313664
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/sewalunafoundation/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/sewalunanz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance integral spirituality and religion through promoting consciousness of the sacred relationship between Man and the Divine Creator and with the Living Earth. To advance Holistic Education and training in the spiritual aspects of ecological sustainability and conservation, for the preservation of the Earth. We achieve this, in part, by teaching, practicing, and embodying the ancient principles and practices of self-enquiry and spiritual healing, and the practices of Sacred Reciprocity and Sacred Alliance with the Divine and the Living Earth. We also work for the preservation of sacred spaces and land we deem to be of special ecological and spiritual significance.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

An incorporated board of trustees. Our trust deed states we must have between THREE to THIRTEEN trustees in order to be fully functional within the parameters defined by the Powers section of our Deed. We currently have THREE trustees that constitute our governance board, including a Chair, and a Secretary. In accordance with our deed, we are operating in a limited capacity until such time as we reappoint one or more additional trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 11/10/2018 $30,415 $3,750
30/09/2017 11/10/2017 $0 $280
30/09/2016 15/07/2016 $875 $254
30/09/2015 22/10/2015 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tessa Hiebendaal Board member 25/10/2017
Ngaere Duff Board member 1/06/2017
Jonathan Evatt Chairman 1/09/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Utkarsh Sanjanwala Trustee 1/06/2017
Christopher Evatt Executive Officer 15/02/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/05/2018 NOC009
26/10/2017 NOC008
20/09/2017 NOC006
5/06/2017 NOC005
23/04/2017 NOC004
23/02/2015 NOC002
14/02/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents