pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


FEBC-NZ Radio International Incorporated
FEBC-NZ
CC10612
9429042717836
Registered

Registration details

11/07/2007
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 21010
Rototuna
Hamilton
3256
2 Cate Road
Rototuna
Hamilton
3210

Charity's other details

0800 433 2269

Africa

Malawi, Mozambique

Asia

Afghanistan, Cambodia, China, India, Indonesia, Israel, Japan, Kazakhstan, Korea, North, Kyrgyzstan, Malaysia, Mongolia, Pakistan, Philippines, Russian Federation, Singapore, Thailand, Vietnam, Yemen


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Motivated by love for God and people, we mobilize people and financial resources in order to broadcast the love of God in Christ and meet human needs in his name without discrimination. We do this in the peoples' heart languages wherever they listen. We encourage New Zealanders to follow Jesus' example and reach out to all peoples of all circumstances to inform, educate, inspire, counsel and comfort them, primarily by media..

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), provide funds for broadcasting

Fund-raising

Religious activities, International activities

Other (please state)

(Children, young people, adults, elderly, people with disabilities, migrants & refugees, religious groups & the general public. )

Entity Structure

An incorporated charitable trust. Governed by a board of Trustees, led by an Executive Director, and employing two part time staff: a Financial Officer and an Administrator/Donor Support Officer. Volunteers also contribute at various times.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 11/11/2020 $447,762 $475,077
31/12/2019 22/10/2019 $423,490 $443,829
31/12/2018 21/11/2018 $415,125 $448,422
31/12/2017 18/12/2017 $405,442 $466,821
31/12/2016 14/12/2016 $345,265 $437,536
31/12/2015 24/11/2015 $367,002 $400,178
31/12/2014 3/11/2014 $352,817 $374,617
31/12/2013 28/11/2013 $407,790 $446,815
31/12/2012 19/11/2012 $337,290 $473,253

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tracey Armanda Olivier Trustee 1/05/2021
Jonathon Horne Trustee 10/05/2017
David Hammond Board Chairman 16/11/2013
Matthew Hudson Perry Executive director 13/06/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kien Choo Trustee 27/03/2021
Irene Gabbie Trustee 24/11/2018
Kineswida Matondo Vermeulen Trustee 1/11/2017
Lois Hockly Trustee 1/11/2017
Tony Arcus Trustee 19/11/2016
Keith Morris Trustee 16/11/2014
Hudson Malcolm Board Member 19/11/2011
Tony Arcus Board Member 13/03/2011
Christine Wratt Trustee 1/03/2010
Terence Woodward Board Member 1/12/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/05/2021 NOC030
6/04/2021 NOC029
11/12/2018 NOC025
25/09/2018 NOC022
10/05/2017 NOC020
8/12/2016 NOC018
24/11/2015 NOC017
9/12/2014 NOC016
28/11/2013 NOC015
19/11/2012 AR006

Charity Documents