pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sisters of Compassion Group Limited
Sisters of Compassion
CC10246
9429038295058
Registered

Registration details

7/05/2007
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Sisters of Compassion Limited 8/05/2007
Sisters of Compassion Group Limited 26/06/2013

Address for service

PO Box 1474
Wellington
6140
2 Rhine Street
Island Bay
Wellington
6023

Charity's other details

04 3837769


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose is to manage the funding of the charitable works of the Sisters of Compassion assisting the poorest and neediest in the Community both in the necessities of life physically and spiritually

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Acts as an umbrella body

Social services

Business Advisory Services

People with disabilities

Other charities, Congregational Trustees

Entity Structure

The company is a holding company funding as required Compassion Housing, The Compassion Soup Kitchen, Our Lady's Home of Compassion Spirituality Centre and Saint Joseph's Rest Home and Hospital

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Our Lady's Home of Compassion Island Bay Limited CC10106
Saint Joseph's Home of Compassion Heretaunga Limited CC10379
The Mother Aubert Home Of Compassion Trust Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 2/12/2019 $9,148,596 $9,137,649
31/12/2018 3/10/2018 $8,669,619 $8,646,297
31/12/2017 3/05/2018 $7,974,838 $7,941,614
31/12/2016 18/12/2016 $7,856,299 $8,079,640
31/12/2015 13/01/2016 $982,396 $976,196
31/12/2014 17/02/2015 $389,625 $360,992
31/12/2013 22/10/2013 $1,020,600 $1,056,400
31/12/2012 5/11/2012 $593,700 $600,000
31/12/2011 30/11/2011 $1,202,500 $1,201,500
31/12/2010 8/12/2010 $506,400 $518,800

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Deirdre Nga Roimata O'Sullivan Director 30/09/2019
Janeita Hildalene Wheturautau Wilson Director 2/07/2018
Alisi Paea 'i Vaiola Tu'iPulotu Director 1/06/2018
Gerard Michael McGreevy Group Chief Executive 1/04/2018
Xiafang Huang Group Accountant 1/04/2018
Julian Michael Maher Director 6/11/2017
Michael Gerard Curtis Director 1/01/2016
Susan Cosgrove Director 1/07/2011
Mary Gemma Schumacher Director 15/06/2011
Gordon Ralph Stewart Director 12/08/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lusiana Raratini Director 26/09/2019
Henare Edward Walmsley Director 31/12/2018
Cicely Elizabeth Hurring Director 30/06/2017
Euan Lindsay Wright Director 31/12/2015
Margaret Anne Mills Director 31/12/2015
May Josephine Gorman Director 31/12/2015
Henry George Lamont Arnott General Manager 30/09/2014
Ailsa Georgina Diamond Accountant 30/06/2014
Xiafang Huang Accountant 30/06/2014
Annette Marie Green Director 1/07/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/11/2019 NOC024
26/09/2019 NOC023
30/05/2019 NOC022
16/07/2018 NOC020
20/12/2016 NOC018
20/12/2016 NOC017
31/10/2016 NOC015
31/10/2016 NOC013
23/01/2015 NOC012
5/11/2012 AR007

Charity Documents