pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Inspire Foundation
CC46337
Registered

Registration details

15/03/2011
March 31

Address for service

C/-
20 Swanleigh Place
Ilam
Christchurch
8041
C/- ALEXANDER PAULL
18 Halton Street
Strowan
Christchurch
8052

Charity's other details

64274320488

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

"1) To provide financial and non-financial assistance to young Cantabrians aged between 15 and 23 years of age who demonstrate extraordinary talents and potential in the areas of Arts, IT, Design, Music, Science, Research, Education, Sport or Community Service. 2) Provide a source of funding for talented young Cantabrians, regardless of their personal or family financial circumstance. 3) Provide a range of non-financial assistance including presentations, development training, mentoring and promotion. 4) Provide updates to members of the foundation about grantee progress, successes and achievements. 5) Maintain good systems and governance of the foundation. 6) Create a foundation model that can be replicated in any province in New Zealand. 7) Hold inspiring grantee award functions to recognise the talents of grantees with inspirational presentations and guest speakers.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, science/technology

Children / young people

Entity Structure

"Trust Structure: The Inspire Foundation is governed by a Trust Board consisting of 4 corporate trustee members.

Annual Returns


Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

Date Submitted For Year Ended Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
- 31/03/2017 - - - -
- 31/03/2016 - - - -
12/10/2015 31/03/2015 $569,059 $160,231
16/09/2014 31/03/2014 $279,982 $147,436
8/08/2013 30/03/2013 $225,171 $113,112
17/09/2012 30/03/2012 $343,476 $48,302

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Keith Allison Trustee 10/06/2011
Robert Neville Davison Trustee 10/06/2011
Jonathan Rodney Chell Wilson Trustee 16/12/2010
Paul Bertram Wright Trustee 16/12/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Donald James Irvine Trustee 1/02/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/10/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents