pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


R. Tucker Thompson Sail Training Trust
CC22076
Registered

Registration details

24/03/2008
May 31

Address for service

PO Box 42
Opua
241
Opua Wharf
Beechy Street
Opua
0241

Charity's other details

(09)402 8430
(09)402 8431
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/R-Tucker-Thompson-128407777195886/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/RTuckerThompson
https://www.instagram.com/rtuckerthompson/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust's mission is Learning for Life through the Sea. The trust aims to: - Through the provision of voyages for our young people preserve the tradition of tall ship sailing and specifically the R. Tucker Thompson - Allow those who sail in her to learn more about who we are, where we come from and where we are going - Make a positive difference to the lives of those who come on board, whether for a day, a week or longer. Our particular focus is to provide life skills to the young people of the Taitokerau Northland region by using the ship for 7-day youth development voyages. To support the funding of the operation, and to enable subsided programmes to be offered to our young people, we operate commercial tourism sailings for 5 months of the year. The surplus from this activity helps to funds our charitable purpose of changing the lives of our young people.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides sail training experiences for personal development aimed at Northland youth

Education / training / research

Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust, with board of Trustees as follows: Joachim Borgstrom, Mike Daniel (Chairman) John Duder, Russell Harris, Bronwyn Hunt, Chloe Phillips-Harris, Michael Simm, Kelly Yakas Staff comprising Jane Hindle (Executive Trustee 0.5 FTE), Sam Meldrum (Operations Mgr 1 FTE) Sophie Camplin (Youth Programmes Mgr 0.5 FTE) Pauline Moretti (Youth Programmes 0.5 FTE) Kyra Crouzat (Admin Assistant 0.5 FTE) Core Crew: Steve Mackay (Master), Tim Grant (Master) Wayne Karauria (Snr Deckhand)

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 November 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 November 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/11/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/11/2017 24/10/2017 $659,300 $629,787
30/11/2016 1/11/2016 $662,623 $631,731
30/11/2015 12/10/2015 $658,708 $595,545
30/11/2014 9/10/2014 $646,455 $621,052
30/11/2013 27/09/2013 $576,425 $611,828
30/11/2012 2/10/2012 $596,055 $637,628
30/11/2011 10/10/2011 $567,153 $641,131
30/11/2010 30/09/2010 $660,230 $590,065
30/11/2009 29/09/2009 $456,358 $437,586

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dion Cory Prime Trustee 17/04/2018
Kelly Marie Yakas Trustee 15/12/2011
Michael Walter Daniel Chairman 19/06/2009
Bronwyn Frances Hunt Trustee 22/06/2007
Jane Hilary Sarah Hindle Executive Trustee 4/06/2006
Joachin Borgstrom Trustee 4/06/2006
John Nelson Duder Trustee 4/06/2006
Michael Wallace Simm Trustee 4/06/2006
Russell Dixon Harris Trustee 4/06/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Chloe Phillips-Harris Trustee 18/10/2016
Ian Lindsay Milestone Chairman 20/09/2013
Mariao Te Huranga Charles Hohaia Trustee 15/12/2011
Catherine Ruth Martin Trustee 19/06/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/06/2018 NOC013
24/04/2017 NOC011
20/12/2013 NOC009
27/09/2013 NOC004
6/03/2012 NOC003
16/08/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents