pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Otago Art Society Incorporated
CC39908
9429042792550
Registered

Registration details

8/05/2009
May 31

Address for service

PO Box 5174
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9054
Dunedin Railway Station
Anzac Square
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

03 477 9465
Facebook icon image
Otago Art Society


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To fulfil the purpose of education in and advancement of art in Otago, and promote interest in the study of, and practice of the fine and applied arts.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Promotion / support of Art

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Artist Members

Entity Structure

We have 4 galleries and a sales gallery shop where all our members can display and sell their work.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30/11/2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30/11/2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/11/2019 29/11/2019 $194,169 $188,622
30/11/2018 3/10/2018 $335,691 $162,863
30/11/2017 23/11/2017 $190,603 $159,811
30/11/2016 31/08/2016 $159,842 $140,854
30/11/2015 20/10/2015 $104,590 $123,166
30/11/2014 4/11/2014 $109,909 $120,106
30/11/2013 27/09/2013 $108,299 $123,035
30/11/2012 25/09/2012 $121,129 $105,018
30/11/2011 11/10/2011 $110,770 $109,635
30/11/2010 10/08/2010 $125,512 $103,696

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Allison Frankie Simpson Councillor 16/08/2018
Anton Lambaart Junior Vice President 16/08/2018
Danielle Lee Munro Councillor 16/08/2018
Lindsay Campbell Councillor 16/08/2018
Lorna Allan Councillor 16/08/2018
Brenda Nyhof Councillor 17/08/2017
Celia Duff Councillor 17/08/2017
Marilene de Souza Gomes Councillor 31/08/2016
Peter Francis Nicholls Councillor 18/08/2016
Doug Hart President 20/08/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Cassandra Rolston Councillor 16/08/2018
David Corballis Councillor 16/08/2018
Denise Benwell Councillor 16/08/2018
Marie Reid Councillor 16/08/2018
Murray Ayson Councillor 16/08/2018
Wendy Mellberg Haecker Council Member 16/08/2018
Anne Baldock Vice President 17/08/2017
Brian Miller Council Member 17/08/2017
Elena Rose Piere Councillor 17/08/2017
Andrena Hall President 18/08/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/10/2019 NOC015
29/10/2019 NOC014
27/08/2018 NOC012
5/11/2015 NOC009
22/10/2014 NOC008
15/10/2013 NOC004
27/09/2013 AR005
14/02/2013 NOC003
25/09/2012 AR004
11/10/2011 AR003

Charity Documents