pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Bikes Welcome Charitable Trust
Bikes Welcome
CC53620
9429043308453
Registered

Registration details

15/07/2016
March 31

Address for service

5 Epuni Street
Hutt Central
Lower Hutt
5011

Charity's other details

021820670
Facebook icon image
bikeswelcome
Twitter icon image
bikeswelcome


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote the provision of bike parking in New Zealand via education, advocacy, promotion, facilitation, information and public engagement. Good bike parking supports everyday cycling which has health and environmental benefits for the entire community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Promote bike parking to professional Bodies and associations), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Other (please state)

(Promote bike parking to professional Bodies and associations)

General public

Entity Structure

Our trust deed allows for between 3 and 6 trustees who form a board responsible for operating the trust to achieve the trusts purpose and goals. Based in Wellington our online presence is the primary form of engagement with bike users, councils, local government, business and organisations nationally.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 23/07/2018 $13,935 $5,977
30/09/2017 22/08/2017 $6,422 $1,695

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Catarina Gutierrez Trustee 15/04/2018
John Martin Lieswyn Trustee 15/04/2018
Lyn Karena Garrett Trustee 15/04/2018
Gene Michael Clendon Secretary 5/09/2016
Joanne Mary Clendon Chairperson, Treasurer 15/07/2016
Jodene Elizabeth Onslow-Osborne Trustee 1/07/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ralph Kiwa Noldan Trustee 15/04/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/05/2018 NOC003
8/05/2018 NOC002

Charity Documents