pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Every Home Global Concern Incorporated
EHGC
CC26048
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Every Home For Christ Incorporated 18/06/2008
Every Home Global Concern Incorporated 28/01/2009

Registration details

17/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 31260
Milford
Auckland
741
329C Sharp Road
RD 2
Warkworth
982

Charity's other details

0800 900 200
#61-2-95704738

Oceania

Australia, Papua New Guinea, Samoa

Africa

Ethiopia, Malawi, Togo, Zambia

South America

Brazil

Asia

Bangladesh, India, Nepal


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To raise support for overseas aid through community development programs which include vocational training, health, education, food security and medical aid.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Manages overseas aid programs through in-country partners)

Other (please state)

(relief of poverty and hunger in developing countries), Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, International activities

Other (please state)

(people in poverty in developing countries)

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society under the Companies Act 1993

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 19/02/2018 $67,339 $100,453
31/12/2016 1/12/2016 $82,487 $72,510
31/12/2015 21/01/2016 $73,645 $94,096
31/12/2014 23/12/2014 $156,023 $119,372
31/12/2013 22/01/2014 $192,328 $193,332
31/12/2012 28/12/2012 $201,177 $194,568
31/12/2011 21/11/2011 $201,883 $221,634
31/12/2010 29/11/2010 $238,492 $274,987
31/12/2009 6/01/2010 $230,480 $198,000
31/12/2008 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Teepa Wawatai Director 17/09/2016
Paul Raymond Hartstonge Director 28/02/2009
Stephen Kendall Whitwell Director 28/02/2009
Eric Roy Leach DIRECTOR -SECRETARY/TREASURER 10/11/2006
John Charles Ealand DIRECTOR -VICE-CHAIRMAN OF BOARD 10/11/2006
Roger Murray Mackay DIRECTOR - CHAIRMAN OF BOARD 10/11/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Shirley Rata Crawshaw DIRECTOR/MINUTE SECRETARY 8/12/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/01/2014 NOC011
22/01/2014 NOC010
28/12/2012 NOC007
21/11/2011 AR004
29/11/2010 AR003
1/06/2010 NOC006
24/11/2009 NOC005
24/08/2009 NOC004
17/06/2009 NOC003
2/03/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents