pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Presbyterian Support Central
CC11182
9429042808657
Registered

Registration details

20/09/2007
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 12706
Thorndon
Wellington
6144
3 George Street
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04)4394900
(04)4725396


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Empowering people, families and communities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Running residential homes, providing community support, social services), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Religious activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering, Residential care and community support of older people

Older people

Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Presbyterian Support Central (PSC) is an Incorporated Society under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957, and was registered on 21 September 2007 under the Charities Act 2005. PSC is governed by a Board comprising of up to nine members, day to day operations are managed by the Chief Executive and his Senior Leadership Team. Under the Enliven brand, we provide rest home, hospital and dementia care. Under the Family Works brand, we provide a wide range of social services.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 25/11/2019 $53,549 $57,498
31/12/2018 22/11/2018 $52,169 $55,656
31/12/2017 30/10/2017 $55,395,000 $56,550,000
31/12/2016 8/12/2016 $65,349,000 $65,356,000
31/12/2015 27/10/2015 $65,482,000 $61,288,000
31/12/2014 5/11/2014 $63,297,000 $60,075,000
31/12/2013 22/01/2014 $63,807,960 $58,716,462
31/12/2012 16/11/2012 $58,693,192 $58,630,922
31/12/2011 15/11/2011 $58,023,022 $55,548,325
31/12/2010 15/11/2010 $57,097,921 $54,056,564

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Deborah Chin Board Member 21/10/2019
Tamati Tuohuroa Cairns Board Member 21/10/2019
Patrick Waite Chief Executive 18/03/2019
So'o Leatigaga Board member 31/10/2016
Marie Callander Board Member 30/03/2015
Nigel Willis Board member 25/06/2012
Stuart Francis Board member 25/06/2012
Peter Sherwin Board member 22/03/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christopher James Nichol Board Member 21/10/2019
Christopher James Graham Chief Executive 22/03/2019
Donovan Lind Board Member 1/11/2018
Stephen David Lorimer Board member 28/02/2018
Ruth Rainey Board Member 30/11/2017
Julia Dawn Hennessy GM Family Works 1/07/2015
Serenah Nicholson Board Member 1/05/2015
Marilyn Ann Wallace Board Member 30/04/2015
Roderick Arnold Oakly Board Member 20/04/2015
Philip Beechey N/A 1/12/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/11/2019 NOC023
19/07/2019 NOC022
8/07/2019 NOC021
31/05/2018 NOC019
24/05/2018 NOC018
21/09/2016 NOC015
7/05/2015 NOC014
29/04/2015 NOC013
16/04/2015 NOC012
8/11/2013 NOC011

Charity Documents