pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Burnside Elim Church Trust
CC26906
9429042948001
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

193 Grahams Road
Burnside
Christchurch
8053

Charity's other details

(03)3584486


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To foster the kingdom of the Lord Jesus Christ

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/06/2018 26/03/2018 $197,589 $187,379
30/06/2017 20/05/2017 $184,800 $207,138
30/06/2016 17/05/2016 $196,129 $188,355
30/06/2015 4/06/2015 $192,233 $186,661
30/06/2014 20/05/2014 $213,831 $241,532
30/06/2013 19/06/2013 $279,089 $257,507
30/06/2012 19/05/2012 $288,237 $263,779
30/06/2011 2/07/2011 $238,275 $232,608
30/06/2010 29/05/2010 $243,323 $227,323

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Shaw Trustee 31/03/2015
Lynn Dianne Morris Trustee 22/11/2012
Andrew Mark Garratt trustee 13/07/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Murray Gee Pastor 31/03/2014
Victor Khim Hee Tan trustee 31/12/2011
Graeme Vincent Flett Pastor 8/02/2011
Victor Tan Oversight 31/12/2008
Alistair Donaldson Oversight 1/01/2008
Helen Gee Pastor 1/01/2008
Jo Donaldson Oversight 1/01/2008
Linda Flett - 1/01/2008
Ramon Utting Leadership Team Member 1/01/2008
Rose Utting Oversight 1/01/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/07/2015 NOC010
5/06/2015 NOC009
19/06/2013 AR006
19/05/2012 AR005
5/07/2011 NOC004
2/07/2011 AR004
15/07/2010 NOC002
29/05/2010 AR003
6/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents