pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kapiti Coast U3A Incorporated
CC22758
9429042650959
Registered

Registration details

9/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 698
Paraparaumu
5254
73 Parata Street
Waikanae 5036
Paraparaumu
Waikanae
5036

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our object is to provide cultural and recreational opportunities for retired or semi-retired people to further their studies in subjects of interest to them free from the pressures of more formal education systems. There are no entry qualifications and no certificates of achievement issued.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides learning opportunities and social occasions for retired people)

Education / training / research

Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering, Fellowship

Older people

Entity Structure

A committee is appointed by our members at an Annual General Meeting. The committee includes a President; Treasurer; Secretary; Membership Coordinator and up to 5 other people .

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 24/02/2021 $13,481 $11,207
30/06/2020 16/02/2020 $14,275 $13,201
30/06/2019 13/06/2019 $19,229 $13,444
30/06/2018 10/06/2018 $13,250 $13,218
30/06/2017 1/07/2017 $12,516 $17,117
30/06/2016 28/06/2016 $15,654 $12,835
30/06/2015 5/08/2015 $14,083 $13,818
30/06/2014 16/05/2014 $13,062 $12,934
30/06/2013 15/05/2013 $8,561 $7,072
30/06/2012 9/03/2012 $9,717 $500

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Belinda Nixon Treasurer 14/02/2020
Peter Belgrave Equipment Officer 1/01/2018
Phil Glasson President 1/01/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lyndell Fitzgibbon Membership Liaison Officer 22/02/2021
Robb Maureen Committee Member 22/02/2021
Sheila Harkess Secretary 1/03/2020
Carole Ralph Secretary 14/02/2020
Colin Payne Treasurer 14/02/2020
Roger Currier President 14/02/2020
Pat Brockie Functions and Hospitality Manager 1/01/2019
Maureen Robb Membership Secretary 6/06/2018
Gavin Wright Equipment Manager 31/12/2017
Maureen A Knox Web Manager 31/12/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/02/2021 NOC021
24/02/2021 NOC019
22/02/2021 NOC018
20/05/2020 NOC017
20/05/2020 NOC016
13/05/2020 NOC015
13/06/2019 NOC010
15/05/2013 AR006
9/03/2012 AR005
16/05/2011 AR004

Charity Documents