pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tauhara Centre Trust
CC35413
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 11
Greenhithe
Auckland
756
60 Acacia Heights Drive
RD 5
Taupo
3385

Charity's other details

07 378 7507
07 378 7528


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Operate a Religious and Education Centre

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Education / training / research, Social services, Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Charitable Organisation

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 7/12/2017 $354,779 $353,738
31/12/2016 22/12/2016 $360,085 $344,510
31/12/2015 15/12/2015 $286,921 $317,001
31/12/2014 17/12/2014 $268,285 $311,808
31/12/2013 18/12/2013 $332,622 $364,345
31/12/2012 24/12/2012 $290,498 $312,853
31/12/2011 4/11/2011 $279,287 $287,002
31/12/2010 29/11/2010 $246,756 $290,649
31/12/2009 22/01/2010 $388,005 $470,618

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Leslie George Wraight Trustee 11/11/2013
Catherine Hill Benson Grace Trustee 27/11/2012
Stephen Nasir Grace Trustee 19/12/2007
Louise Belcher - Breuer Trustee 19/08/1995

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/12/2013 NOC007
13/12/2013 NOC006
17/12/2012 AR005
6/12/2010 NOC002
22/01/2010 AR002

Charity Documents