pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


"Have a Heart"
CC51536
Registered

Registration details

24/12/2014
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 495
Whakatane
3158
130 James Street
Whakatane 3120
Whakatane
3120

Charity's other details

07 021903403
Facebook icon image
haveaheart

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust will be to provide services for the betterment of the lives of the poor, abused, disabled and marginalised people of New Zealand. To assist in the creation and development of programmes identified by the Trustees to provide benefits to people in the community who because of their circumstances are in need of assistance and support. To be in collaberation and networking with various other groups and social service agencies, jointly and corporately providing assistance and making referrals as the need requires. To generate and raise funds, grants and income, manage the same for the aims and objectives herein stated. To provide other support and assistance consistent with this charitable purpose.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Forms Collabartion and networks with other organisations

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Trust will be governed by a board of trustees who will ensure and adhere to the Trustee Act in all matters pertaining to the running of the Trust and the Trust Deed of the Trust. Subcommitees will be appointed and given delegated powers to Manage all activities and projects assigned by the Trustees.

Annual Returns


Date Submitted For Year Ended Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/09/2017 31/03/2017 $201,827 $46,576
8/09/2016 31/03/2016 $67,534 $9,652

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Philip Ian Vermaak Member 12/12/2104
Tristan Gareth Totterdel Vine Member 12/05/2017
Kylie Amanda Provan Member 10/01/2017
Levi Donald Magee Member 10/01/2017
Damayanthi Pakiarani Black Treasurer 21/12/2016
John Phillip Christian Member 1/12/2016
Peter Cameron Member 1/12/2016
Daniel Christoffel Barnard Founder/Chairman 12/12/2014
Steven Chris Barnard member 12/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Arthur Thomas Member 27/01/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/05/2017 NOC007
10/05/2017 NOC006
10/05/2017 NOC005
27/01/2017 NOC004
21/12/2016 NOC003
8/09/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents