pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The New Zealand Poetry Society Incorporated
CC20250
9429042783183
Registered

Registration details

12/12/2007
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 5283
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
14 Albemarle Road
Northland
Wellington
6012

Charity's other details

(04)4759359
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/NewZealandPoetrySociety/
Twitter icon image
@nzps
instagram @nzpoetrysociety


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Advances education by promoting, developing and supporting poets and poetry in New Zealand

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Advances education by promoting, developing and supporting poets and poetry in New Zealand.

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, International activities

General public

Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

We are a membership based society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2019 13/11/2019 $15,739 $26,243
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $15,976 $19,859
30/09/2017 30/09/2017 $14,751 $12,658
30/09/2016 15/01/2017 $24,808 $22,920
30/09/2015 28/09/2015 $18,006 $12,058
30/09/2014 22/10/2014 $18,834 $17,941
30/09/2013 24/09/2013 $20,332 $21,537
30/09/2012 26/09/2012 $25,348 $26,857
30/09/2011 22/09/2011 $26,161 $24,469

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gary Bradshaw Secretary 30/08/2020
Katharine Allard Treasurer 6/06/2020
Sue Le Mesurier Vice-President 22/06/2019
Shane Hollands President 9/09/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Laurice Gilbert Treasurer 31/07/2019
Mike Subritzky Vice President 31/12/2018
Anna Hudson Treasurer 19/11/2017
Katharine Allard Secretary 9/09/2017
Anna Hudson Secretary 8/09/2017
Laurice Denise Gilbert Acting President 8/09/2017
Laurice Gilbert President/National Coordinator 11/04/2016
Lonnard Dean Watkins Vice-President 11/04/2016
Laurice Denise Gilbert Administrator 31/03/2015
Carmen Downes Committee member 31/03/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/07/2020 NOC027
27/07/2018 NOC024
7/12/2017 NOC023
23/05/2016 NOC019
22/10/2014 NOC014
24/09/2013 NOC011
24/09/2013 AR006
26/09/2012 NOC010
10/11/2011 NOC009
22/09/2011 NOC008

Charity Documents