pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Volunteering Auckland Trust
CC23758
9429042589747
Registered

Registration details

1/05/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 8814
Symonds Street
Auckland
1150
Level 2, Villa Dalmacija,
10 New North Road
Eden Terrace
Auckland
1021

Charity's other details

09 3777887
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/VolunteeringAKL/
Twitter icon image
@VolunteeringAKL


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Dedicated to leading positive change in the community through the support and promotion of volunteering.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides Training

Promotion of volunteering

Education / training / research, Community development

Other charities

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Trust Deed states that we must have between 6 and 12 trustees that constitute our governance board, including 2 executive officer positions: Chair and Treasurer.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 10/01/2021 $201,402 $248,630
31/12/2019 19/12/2019 $262,766 $239,996
31/12/2018 21/01/2019 $252,429 $234,943
31/03/2018 9/04/2018 $211,365 $203,721
31/12/2016 29/03/2017 $200,563 $217,092
31/12/2015 27/10/2015 $262,204 $229,732
31/12/2014 21/02/2015 $211,166 $223,770
31/12/2013 1/05/2014 $247,396 $224,129
31/12/2012 31/01/2013 $250,420 $208,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Parathan Selvarajah Trustee 1/06/2020
Eric Shih Hann Yeo Trustee 1/05/2020
Fau Tiatia-Farani Trustee 1/05/2020
Sue Plowman Trustee 1/05/2020
Felicity Ann Willamson Trustee 20/06/2018
Abigail Elizabeth Milnes Trustee 21/04/2017
Derek Rennie Trustee 21/04/2017
Rich Easton Chair 17/07/2015
Richard Muir Treasurer 17/07/2015
Dr Mary Dawson Trustee 19/04/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Frazer Orr Trustee 11/04/2019
Jane Bollard Trustee 11/04/2019
Margaret Antunovich Trustee 23/05/2018
Suzanna Pomeroy Trustee 22/09/2017
Robert Blucher Trustee 21/07/2017
Cathie Martin Trustee 21/04/2017
Nicholas James Scott Trustee 21/04/2017
Guy Alexander Trustee 30/09/2016
Gabby Clezy Trustee 17/04/2015
Matthew James Parkinson Trustee 17/04/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/08/2020 NOC020
29/04/2019 NOC018
17/10/2018 NOC016
24/05/2017 NOC014
19/10/2016 NOC012
19/10/2016 NOC011
4/10/2016 NOC010
4/10/2016 NOC009
4/10/2016 NOC008
27/10/2015 NOC007

Charity Documents