pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Central Otago Clutha Trails Limited
CC51050
9429041140895
Registered

Registration details

16/10/2014
March 31

Address for service

33 Earnscleugh Road
Bridge Hill
Alexandra
9320
42 Ventry Street
Alexandra 9320
Alexandra
9320

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Is to maintain the purposes of the Roxburgh Gorge Trail Charitable Trust and the Clutha Gold Trail Charitable Trust being the shareholders of the company. That purpose being to supervise, finance, and maintain the pedestrian and cycle trail from Alexandra to Lawrence in order to facilitate and promote public use and enjoyment of this area.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Environment / conservation, Sport / recreation

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Incorporated under the Companies Act 1993 on 26 March 2014.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $125,332 $111,052
30/09/2018 26/09/2018 $149,206 $146,763
30/09/2017 24/11/2017 $124,191 $99,019
30/09/2016 27/09/2017 $68,255 $74,803
30/09/2015 6/09/2017 $38,725 $26,439

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna Grace Mickell Director 15/08/2019
Barrie John Wills Director 26/03/2014
Murray Alexander Paterson Director 26/03/2014
Roderick John Peirce Director 26/03/2014
Stephen Foster Jeffery Director 26/03/2014
Robert Alexander Roy Treasurer 16/05/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Desley Harrex Director 1/12/2018

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents