pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Ranfurly Veterans' Trust
CC24334
9429042958130
Registered

Registration details

13/05/2008
September 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Ranfurly Trust 14/05/2008
The Ranfurly Veterans' Trust 18/09/2013

Address for service

PO Box 27393
Mount Roskill
Auckland
1440
539 Mount Albert Road
Three Kings
Auckland
1042

Charity's other details

09 625 8310
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/Ranfurlyveteranstrust/
https://www.instagram.com/the_ranfurly_veterans_trust/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide financial support to those veterans of military service living in NZ who need this help.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Health

Other (please state)

(Discharged service men and women and their dependants.)

Entity Structure

A trust

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
The Poppy Foundation of Auckland Trust CC54734

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2021 31/03/2021 $1,034,204 $457,812
31/05/2020 3/06/2020 $1,452,839 $441,182
31/03/2019 24/06/2019 $441,717 $378,593
31/05/2018 1/03/2019 $726,143 $306,308
31/03/2017 13/07/2017 $619,065 $255,667
31/03/2016 26/04/2016 $464,196 $271,484
31/03/2015 31/01/2015 $315,201 $271,135
31/03/2014 1/05/2014 $249,044 $386,137
31/03/2013 22/02/2013 $192,701 $374,030

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Grant Richard Ellis Trustee 9/12/2020
Melva Joy Nicholson Trustee 24/06/2020
Anthony Pierce Hay Trustee 9/08/2013
Peter Jon Skogstad Trustee 9/08/2013
David Eric Turner Trustee 1/11/2006
Gregory James Moyle Trustee 1/06/2002
David McGregor Chair 1/04/2001

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Douglas McGuire Trustee 9/12/2020
Graeme Mckenzie Mckay Executive/Deputy Chair 11/10/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/05/2020 NOC013
29/05/2017 NOC008
10/10/2013 NOC002
10/10/2013 NOC001
22/02/2013 AR005
15/02/2010 AR002

Charity Documents