pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Terrible New Zealand Charitable Trust
Terrible Foundation (New Zealand)
CC50738
N/A
Deregistered
16/12/2019
The Charities Registration Board has removed Terrible New Zealand Charitable Trust from the Charities Register and issued disqualification orders on both the entity and two of its Officers (Mr Alberic Whale and Dr David Whale). Please refer Charity Documentation to view the orders issued.

Below are details of Terrible New Zealand Charitable Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

4/07/2014
July 24
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 16/12/2019 The Charities Registration Board has removed Terrible New Zealand Charitable Trust from the Charities Register and issued disqualification orders on both the entity and two of its Officers (Mr Alberic Whale and Dr David Whale). Please refer Charity Documentation to view the orders issued.
Registered 4/07/2014

Address for service

18 Wycola Avenue
Hei Hei
Christchurch
8042

Charity's other details

6439743405
Facebook icon image
https://facebook.com/terrible
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/terrible
https://instagram.com/terriblefoundation


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To hold funds to devote or apply to any charitable purpose in New Zealand. which works towards a world without Poverty or inequality while meeting the criteria in our trust deed. This is explained in greater detail within our Trust Deed

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Fund-raising

Environment / conservation, Community development, International activities, Promotion of volunteering

Other charities

Entity Structure

Trustee, Mr Alberic Whale (Current Protector) Trustee, Mr Stephen Calvert Trustee, Dr Melanie Atkinson Trustee, Dr David Whale (Chairperson) The Trust has a direct interest in the following unlisted New Zealand companies; I. Terrible Talk New Zealand Limited (100% shareholding) II. Number Eighteen Limited (50% shareholding) III. Terrible Web Services Limited (45% shareholding by way of agreement) The trust exerts direct control over these organisations.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Number Eighteen Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Terrible Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Terrible Talk New Zealand (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Terrible Web Services (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/01/2020 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/01/2019 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/01/2018 8/02/2018 $1,461,584 $325,584
31/01/2017 24/05/2017 $440,643 $166,634
31/01/2016 13/04/2016 $200,070 $1,280
31/01/2015 17/04/2015 $0 $0

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alberic Whale Terrible New Zealand Charitable Trust 28/03/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Melanie Atkinson Trustee 10/12/2018
Robert Seddon-Smith Trustee 10/12/2018
Stephen Calvert Trustee 8/03/2018
Chaley Warne Trustee 27/01/2015
Michael Field Trustee 2/09/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/01/2017 NOC011
2/05/2016 NOC009
19/12/2015 NOC008
29/07/2015 NOC007
22/07/2015 NOC006
22/07/2015 NOC005
13/05/2015 NOC004
9/04/2015 NOC003
16/12/2014 NOC002
2/09/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents