pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

The Susan Couch - Crime Victims Charitable Trust
CC37105
9429043187140
Deregistered
10/07/2017
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of The Susan Couch - Crime Victims Charitable Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

22/01/2009
March 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 10/07/2017 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 22/01/2009

Address for service

Private Bag 92093
Victoria Street West
Auckland
1142
41 Shortland Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Social services

Accommodation / housing

General public

Children / young people, Victims of crime


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The first annual return due on the 30/09/2009 will cover less than six months after the charity is registered. For this reason the charity should be granted an exemption to filling their first annual return under s41 (1), and the first annual return will be due by the 30/09/2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2017 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2016 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2015 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2014 10/02/2015 $0 $0
30/09/2013 14/10/2014 $1,000 $285
30/09/2012 1/06/2012 $600 $968
30/09/2011 2/12/2011 $2,859 $1,617
30/09/2010 21/03/2011 $53 $1,151

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Annette Sylvia Pressley Trustee 13/03/2009
Brian Gerald Coburn Trustee 15/08/2008
Dennis Jay Gates Trustee 15/08/2008
Brian Phillip Henry Trustee 13/08/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/06/2012 AR004
2/12/2011 AR003
21/03/2011 AR002

Charity Documents