pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Gleniti Baptist Church
CC28883
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

58 Gleniti Road
Gleniti
Timaru
7910

Charity's other details

036862829
036862829


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To proclaim the gospel of Jesus Christ, provide instruction in the Word of God and its implications on daily life, to encourage members to assemble regularly for worship, to express the love of God to the community through ministries of the church including the provision of practical care. To engage in the task of mission both in New Zealand and overseas.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Religious groups, General Public

Entity Structure

Church- registered charity. the Church is an autonomous body within the Baptist Union of New Zealand and is incorporated under the Baptist Union Act of Incorporation 1923. It is governed by a team comprising the Pastor, Elders and Deacons who are elected by the membership of the church at least biannually.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 January 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 January 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 23/10/2018 $218,401 $191,986
31/12/2017 3/12/2017 $207,766 $160,430
31/12/2016 23/12/2016 $197,058 $165,482
31/12/2015 7/12/2015 $210,356 $177,371
31/12/2014 21/11/2014 $199,752 $148,711
31/12/2013 27/11/2013 $174,053 $134,297
31/12/2012 5/10/2012 $155,175 $138,395
31/12/2011 16/11/2011 $170,707 $157,870
31/12/2010 30/08/2010 $148,707 $125,842
31/12/2009 11/02/2010 $160,842 $126,966

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brendan Paul Grant Elder 29/08/2018
Diane Mary Turner Elder 29/08/2018
Maurice Butler Deacon 23/08/2017
Mark Theodore Pavelka Pastor 31/08/2016
Peter Leslie Coulter Deacon 25/08/2010
Denyse Kay Taylor Deacon 20/08/2005
John Stuart Davey Elder 20/08/2005
Neville Roland Cross Deacon 20/08/2005
Ronald Grant Taylor Treasurer 20/08/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Elaine Daphne Caird Elder 29/08/2018
Kathryn Mary Robinson Elder 29/08/2018
Kerry John Turner Deacon 29/08/2018
John Trendor Holden Elder 23/08/2017
Zelda Zeelie ELder 23/08/2017
Francis Michael Arthur Deacon 31/08/2016
Murray Ross Hamilton Pastor 31/08/2016
Elaine Daphne Caird Secretary 25/08/2015
Keerie Zeelie Elder 25/08/2015
Elwyn Samuel Bates Elder 8/08/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/12/2015 NOC008
21/11/2014 NOC007
5/10/2012 AR005
19/12/2011 NOC003
30/08/2010 NOC002
11/02/2010 AR002

Charity Documents