pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Lincoln University Foundation
LUF
CC23761
Registered

Registration details

1/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 85084
Lincoln University
Lincoln
7647
Cnr Springs Road And Ellesmere Junction Road
Lincoln
Christchurch
7647

Charity's other details

03 423 0536

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

to advance education in the fields of agriculture and related interests in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation, International activities, Economic development, Agriculture

Other (please state)

(NZ Agriculture), General public

Entity Structure

charitable trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2017 21/09/2017 $732,596 $316,550
30/09/2016 23/11/2016 $450,011 $267,503
30/09/2015 21/10/2015 $537,922 $234,109
30/09/2014 27/05/2014 $228,120 $206,238
30/09/2013 12/06/2013 $382,567 $181,366
30/09/2012 25/09/2012 $190,802 $131,964
30/09/2011 10/06/2011 $232,794 $183,342
30/09/2010 7/07/2010 $233,000 $96,000
30/09/2009 26/06/2009 $21,000 $113,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Stephen Mark Smith Trustee 1/06/2017
Richard Riddell Trustee 22/05/2017
Sebastian Wilberforce Secretary 30/05/2016
Robin Pollard Trustee 29/02/2016
Barry Brook Trustee 29/06/2012
Benjamin James Todhunter Chairman 13/03/2009
Patricia Macfarlane Trustee 9/05/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anthony Hall Trustee 31/05/2017
Derek Leigh Newman Trustee 22/05/2017
Thomas Craig Lambie Trustee 8/04/2016
Dr Andrew West Trustee 26/06/2015
Jeannette Elizabeth Latham Secretary 30/06/2014
Neil Taylor Trustee 27/09/2013
Roger John Field Trustee 19/04/2012
Andrew Henry Thomas Trustee 9/05/2008
Nicola Burgess Secretary 16/06/1916

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/05/2016 NOC011
13/04/2016 NOC010
12/04/2016 NOC009
12/04/2016 NOC008
27/05/2014 NOC007
27/09/2013 NOC001
12/06/2013 AR006
25/09/2012 AR005
10/06/2011 AR004
26/06/2009 AR002

Charity Documents