pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Otago Mental Health Support Trust
Otago Mental Health Support Trust
CC28476
9429042877004
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 5021
Dunedin
9054
3RD FLOOR
109 Princes Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

03 477 2598
03 477 6749


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Otago Mental Health Support Trust promotes full lives for people experiencing mental distress

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provide Services of Support

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering, Research, Support

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2018 19/12/2018 $308,882 $308,586
31/12/2017 13/12/2017 $289,159 $289,175
31/12/2016 18/12/2016 $297,239 $292,459
31/12/2015 29/11/2015 $292,529 $276,834
31/12/2014 22/02/2015 $288,853 $282,327
31/12/2013 25/11/2013 $277,212 $260,242
31/12/2012 26/11/2012 $273,398 $255,968
31/12/2011 19/12/2011 $272,154 $258,073
31/12/2010 24/11/2010 $262,598 $254,517

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Isabella Le ber Trustee 16/04/2019
Alan John Shanks Trustee 17/07/2018
Fiona P Trustee 21/03/2017
John Fallon Trustee 20/09/2016
Marian Hobbs Trustee 20/10/2015
Marie Laufiso Trustee 18/08/2015
Lisa Perniskie Trustee 1/08/2015
Robyn Patrick Trustee 1/02/2015
Elizabeth Evans Trustee 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Grant Cooper Manager 15/01/2019
Lewis Vandenberg Trustee 17/10/2017
Ian Hamilton Williams Chairperson/Trustee 1/08/2017
Hazel Heal Board Member 1/02/2015
Jill Stewart Board Member 1/12/2014
Lizette Spall Board Member 22/06/2014
Annie Coughlan Trustee 1/09/2013
Donna Beck Trustee 1/03/2013
Carol Gray Trustee 1/12/2012
Teresa Mulligan Trustee 10/07/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/02/2019 NOC016
8/02/2019 NOC015
20/11/2018 NOC013
9/12/2016 NOC010
13/10/2016 NOC009
19/01/2016 NOC008
20/10/2015 NOC007
23/02/2015 NOC006
23/11/2012 AR004
20/12/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents