pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


North East Valley Community Development Project Incorporated
The Valley Project
CC45702
9429042674184
Registered

Registration details

14/11/2010
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 8118
Gardens
Dunedin
9041
262 North Road
North East Valley
Dunedin
9010

Charity's other details

03 473 8614
Facebook icon image
@valleyproject
Twitter icon image
@valleyproject
Instagram @valleyproject


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To enhance the life of the community, in particular to promote the wellbeing of local children and their whanau. In particular, to support local organisations, and community members to promote, coordinate and collaborate activities in education, health and care, environment, community action and promotion, as well as establish new charitable activities when deemed appropriate by the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides community led initiatives to strengthen the suburbs structure.)

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Society governed by an executive board of volunteers

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Dalmore Community Gardens (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
North East Valley Community Gardens (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Open Valley Urban Eco Sanctuary (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
TV473 (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 27/10/2019 $245,663 $221,670
30/09/2018 20/12/2018 $202,998 $176,732
30/09/2017 9/02/2018 $116,720 $193,675
30/09/2016 20/12/2016 $578,569 $221,394
30/09/2015 28/09/2015 $262,674 $213,511
30/09/2014 25/09/2014 $195,698 $198,841
30/09/2013 30/10/2013 $369,556 $139,141
30/09/2012 29/11/2012 $48,740 $68,633
30/09/2011 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Chris Burgess Treasurer 26/08/2019
Hinewairangi Ripeka Broughton Officer 19/06/2019
Marama Smyth Officer 19/06/2019
Nicky Bisley Officer 19/06/2019
Radha Forest Officer 19/06/2019
Natasha Murachver Officer 27/06/2018
Ian Telfer Chair 28/06/2017
Lois Scott-Muir Officer 28/06/2017
Sarah Gallagar Secretary 28/06/2017
Rob Thomson Vice Chair 15/06/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Fraser Arthur Hunter Treasurer 19/06/2019
Joseph Gerald Flaherty Officer 19/06/2019
Megan Turnbull Officer 19/06/2019
Nolan John Hill Officer 19/06/2019
Stephen Tripp Chair 19/06/2019
Peter Abey BOT representative 8/04/2019
Rosa Rhiannon Mile-Seely Officer 8/04/2019
Christopher Wilson Officer 27/06/2018
Margaret Hillerby Officer 27/06/2018
Steve O'Connor Officer 27/06/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/07/2019 NOC016
9/04/2019 NOC015
9/02/2018 NOC013
24/10/2014 NOC009
24/10/2014 NOC008
23/07/2014 NOC007
24/04/2014 NOC006
5/02/2014 NOC005
17/10/2013 AR002
10/07/2013 NOC003

Charity Documents