pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pohutukawa Coast Sea Rescue Trust
CC35738
9429043078462
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 18
Beachlands
Auckland
2147
213 Maraetai Drive
Maraetai
Auckland
2018

Charity's other details

09 536 5063


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust supports, a marine search and rescue service which prevents death, injury or accident at sea, and emergency relief, Civil Defence, water safety education, boatmaster/seamanship education, first aid education, and enhancing and protecting the public’s use and enjoyment of the marine environment and of the local area, and supporting other local not for profit service organisations.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Emergency / disaster relief

Education / training / research, Social services, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The PCSRT Board of Trustees (all voluntary positions) comprises of six trustees; two representatives from the local community and one representative appointed from each of the following organisations: Coastguard Maraetai, The Rotary Club of Pohutukawa Coast, The Pohutukawa Coast Community Association, the local Police, and other officers such as treasurer and secretary appointed by the Trustees as required.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $5,802 $11,649
30/09/2018 6/12/2018 $10,894 $13,465
30/09/2017 21/09/2017 $30,476 $57,164
30/09/2016 24/09/2016 $58,740 $39,142
30/09/2015 14/09/2015 $81,731 $94,632
30/09/2014 8/09/2014 $71,468 $56,469
30/09/2013 23/09/2013 $81,099 $24,465
30/09/2012 7/09/2012 $50,514 $109,623
30/09/2011 25/08/2011 $45,524 $29,534
30/09/2010 9/09/2010 $58,857 $21,942

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alex Garden Trustee 1/11/2017
Andrea Chapman Treasurer 24/05/2017
Adrian Fisher Trustee 25/04/2017
Christine Maslowski Trustee 25/04/2017
Michael Sommerville Chairperson 25/04/2017
Robert Edward Reay Trustee 28/02/2017
Warwick Rotherham Trustee 26/01/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nigel Wooding Trustee 31/10/2017
Brian Brooke Treasurer 30/04/2017
Garry Larsen QSM Trustee 30/04/2017
Hazel Allsopp Secretary 30/04/2017
Lloyd Raymond Allsopp Trustee 30/04/2017
Rowan Kenneth Muir Trustee 30/04/2017
John Mccristell Webber Trustee 28/02/2017
Raymond John Beaver Trustee 13/11/2015
Angela Whittle Trustee 22/07/2015
Gregory James Wilson Trustee 17/07/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/03/2018 NOC021
21/02/2018 NOC020
10/02/2018 NOC019
2/08/2017 NOC017
6/03/2017 NOC016
4/03/2017 NOC015
28/03/2016 NOC013
24/03/2016 NOC012
28/01/2016 NOC011
15/08/2013 AR006

Charity Documents