pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


City Impact Church
CC24685
Registered

Registration details

21/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 35211
Browns Bay
Auckland
753
794 East Coast Road
Oteha
Auckland
630

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Christian Charitable Aims - To be a church that preaches the Gospel message of Jesus Christ and to see believers grow into commited and mature disciples.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Community development, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(Our attendees (members) are from all age groups and ethnicities. Mostly from the immediate communities but some from further afield. New Zealanders and migrants. )

Entity Structure

A Charitable Trust - A Not-For-Profit organisation governed by its Board of Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 29/09/2018 $13,220,464 $13,474,767
30/09/2017 27/09/2017 $13,745,053 $13,007,176
30/09/2016 6/10/2016 $13,552,397 $12,755,486
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $15,293,828 $13,695,721
30/06/2014 1/07/2014 $10,366,000 $10,260,000
30/06/2013 1/07/2013 $9,157,268 $9,289,249
30/06/2012 2/07/2012 $10,048,407 $7,829,976
30/06/2011 1/08/2011 $7,220,000 $7,360,000
30/06/2010 23/07/2010 $7,220,000 $7,360,000
30/06/2009 5/11/2009 $6,537,000 $6,202,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Graham Andrew Anthony Burger Trustee 3/12/2009
Beverly Ann Mortlock Trsutee 18/08/1999
Paul Gavin Adams Trustee 18/08/1999
Susan Ann Adams Trustee 18/08/1999
Peter James Mortlock Trustee 22/05/1984

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/11/2014 NOC007
2/07/2012 AR006
15/03/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents