pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


IHC New Zealand Incorporated
IHC
CC22478
9429041905760
Registered

Registration details

2/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

c/- Duncan Cotterill
PO Box 10376
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
c/- Duncan Cotterill, Level 2
50 Customhouse Quay
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04)4722247
(04)4720429


Group Members


Below are all the members of IHC New Zealand. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Accessible Properties New Zealand Limited
Choices New Zealand Limited
Idea Services Limited
IHC New Zealand Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

As set out in the Society's constitution, including, among others, promoting the welfare of all persons with an intellectual disability

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

People with disabilities

Accommodation / housing, Vocational, Family Support

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Adults

Entity Structure

Registered Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by the 31st of December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by the 31st of December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'IHC New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $318,154,000 $304,692,000
31/12/2015 11/12/2015 $64,042,000 $42,212,000
31/12/2014 27/01/2015 $56,258,000 $47,799,000
31/12/2013 9/01/2014 $50,381,000 $55,674,000
31/12/2012 10/01/2013 $47,493,001 $37,201,000
31/12/2011 9/01/2012 $44,927,000 $33,682,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony John Shaw Board Member 25/09/2019
Susanne Kay Win Board Member 2/07/2019
Lynne Marie Lane Board member 7/09/2018
Pauline Alice Winter Board member 7/09/2018
Neil Taylor Board member 30/04/2009
Barbara Rocco Board Member 4/04/2006
Ralph Jones Chief Executive 14/08/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Quigg Board Member 31/03/2020
Robert Steele Board member 12/05/2019
Jason George Hollingworth Board member 16/04/2019
Anne Gilbert Board Member 7/09/2018
Shelley Payne Board member 7/09/2018
Donald Thompson National President 7/09/2017
Susan Peterson Board Member 25/02/2016
Joanne Lynlee Cribb Board Member 5/10/2015
John Falloon Board Member 2/07/2014
Stephnie Roberts Board member 31/10/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/10/2019 NOC026
6/09/2019 NOC024
5/09/2019 NOC023
16/04/2019 NOC022
16/04/2019 NOC021
17/10/2018 NOC019
12/10/2018 NOC018
12/09/2018 NOC017
12/09/2018 NOC016
21/08/2017 NOC015

Charity Documents