pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Community Foundations of New Zealand Incorporated
CC50387
9429043324262
Registered

Registration details

20/03/2014
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 24220
Manners Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6142
50 Manners Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 381 2224
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/CommunityFNZ
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/CommunityFNZ
https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCIDpQuydILmwNSBkOVCmUig


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(a) Promote the concept of Community Foundations in New Zealand; (b) Provide Community Foundations in New Zealand with a national association of which they can become members; (c) Establish and maintain high standards of membership of the Association and thereby enhance the credibility of Community Foundations which are Members; (d) Protect, encourage and promote by all lawful means the interests of the member Community Foundations; (e) Promote the unity, liaison and exchange of information between Members and prospective Members and with overseas Community Foundations.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Community development

Fund-raising

Other charities

Entity Structure

The CFNZ Board of Trustees (all voluntary positions) comprises up to seven Trustees. Each Member has the right to nominate one or more persons as Trustees. The Board is responsible for setting the direction and conducting the business of the organisation. CFNZ has informal relationships with sister organisations internationally, to enable and promote the dissemination of ideas and practices.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 7/09/2020 $151,118 $148,590
30/09/2019 23/08/2019 $141,941 $117,877
30/09/2018 21/08/2018 $111,580 $73,458
30/09/2017 9/10/2017 $98,753 $11,472
30/09/2016 24/10/2016 $16,543 $15,149
30/09/2015 11/06/2015 $5,054 $4,179
30/09/2014 12/08/2014 $18,225 $17,285

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Raymond John Key Board member 25/09/2019
Lori Abert Luke Board Member 3/10/2018
Patrick Joseph Brown Board Member 21/10/2016
Colin Dean Christie Board Member 7/09/2016
Christopher David Astley Milne Board Member 9/06/2015
Stacey Alice Scott Chairperson 11/04/2013
William Beau Holland Board Member 11/04/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sandi Rochelle Wood Board Member 14/05/2020
Roslyn Mary Martin Secretary 28/02/2017
Sally Morrison Board Member 30/11/2016
Hilary Sumpter Trustee 30/04/2016
Margrietha Johanna Theron Board Member 30/04/2016
Brian Arthur Burge Board Member 30/06/2015
Nicola Wilkins Board Member 30/06/2015
Trevor James Croy Board Member 30/04/2015
Stephen Chaney Board Member 8/04/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/10/2018 NOC010
10/10/2018 NOC009
16/03/2017 NOC006
21/10/2016 NOC004
20/10/2016 NOC003
5/10/2016 NOC002
12/08/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents