pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Church of Scientology of New Zealand Incorporated
Church of Scientology
CC27252
9429042852230
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 6791
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
136 Grafton Road
Outsource Tower building
Grafton
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

09 3790900


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The advancement of the religious and other charitable work of Scientology in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Human Rights

General public

Entity Structure

A Board of Directors is elected each year. There is a voluntary staff of around 50 people.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 17/10/2018 $2,885,768 $3,269,627
30/06/2017 16/10/2017 $1,268,570 $3,196,187
30/06/2016 13/09/2016 $2,424,098 $2,278,956
30/06/2015 7/05/2016 $1,388,841 $589,942
30/06/2014 11/12/2014 $1,575,302 $696,852
30/06/2013 18/11/2013 $780,101 $558,321
30/06/2012 29/08/2012 $842,299 $797,841
30/06/2011 11/08/2011 $1,235,207 $966,858
30/06/2010 4/11/2010 $3,161,933 $580,173
30/06/2009 22/06/2010 $374,000 $3,776,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gaylene Fraser Secretary 13/05/2018
Dana Lee Chairperson 14/09/2017
JJ Ku Treasurer 14/09/2017
Steve Green Member 14/09/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anna Hahich Treasurer 14/09/2017
Michael Victor Ferriss Secretary 14/09/2017
Sancia Marilyn Rooney Chairperson 14/09/2017
Lauren Jill Ferriss Treasurer 21/06/2012
Marion Janet Moffat Chairperson 21/06/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/05/2018 NOC013
16/05/2018 NOC012
15/05/2018 NOC011
4/04/2017 NOC009
7/05/2016 NOC008
29/08/2012 AR005
22/06/2012 NOC003
5/06/2012 NOC002
11/08/2011 AR004
22/06/2010 AR002

Charity Documents