pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


RMH South Island Trust
Ronald McDonald House South Island
CC24375
9429042946199
Registered

Registration details

13/05/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 1463
Christchurch
8140
33 Cashel Street
334 Lincoln Road
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

03 377 3311
03 377 3414
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/RonaldMcDonaldHouseSouthIsland/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/rmhsouth


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

- To own, establish and manage a Ronald McDonald house in the Canterbury region. - To provide a facility, to create an environment for the families of children suffering cancer and other life threatening diseases. - To encourage the public to participate in the work of the trust - To do other acts that would promote the attainment of the objectives of the trust.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides accommodation to families who have travelled to Christchurch for care of their child at one of Christchurchs Hospitals.

Accommodation / housing

Health, Social services, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

RMH South Island Trust is an incorporated trust comprising of a Chairman/Trustee, Deputy Chairman/Trustee, Treasurer/Trustee, 7 Trustees, 6 full-time and 7 part-time team members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/06/2018 30/05/2018 $2,411,586 $1,430,162
30/06/2017 5/07/2017 $2,348,656 $1,402,053
30/06/2016 26/05/2016 $2,304,819 $1,413,175
30/06/2015 19/06/2015 $2,225,144 $1,347,146
30/06/2014 14/08/2014 $2,295,191 $1,201,842
30/06/2013 6/08/2013 $1,702,073 $1,312,723
30/06/2012 27/06/2012 $1,548,985 $1,311,195
30/06/2011 17/06/2011 $1,889,546 $1,252,337
30/06/2010 21/07/2010 $1,283,811 $1,062,033

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Christopher James Youngman Trustee 17/05/2016
Graham Muir Trustee 4/09/2014
David William Whalley Deputy Chairman/Trustee 23/07/2014
Paul Deavoll Chairman/Trustee 9/12/2008
David Kipp Alexander Trustee / Treasurer 14/05/2008
Gavin Mark Abbot Trustee 14/05/2008
Janetta Margaret Skiba Trustee 14/05/2008
Bruce William Davis Trustee 1/06/1999

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stuart Alexander Leck Trustee 22/05/2018
Robert Lindsay Aitken Trustee 13/02/2018
Susan Tansey Trustee 17/05/2016
Amanda Cooper-davies Trustee 19/03/2013
Pauline Clark Trustee 30/11/2012
Dorothy Robyn Gordon Trustee 15/07/2012
Lorelei Giselle Mason Trustee 31/12/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/06/2017 NOC012
29/06/2016 NOC011
12/08/2015 NOC010
7/07/2015 NOC009
6/07/2015 NOC008
26/06/2013 AR006
10/09/2012 NOC003
27/06/2012 AR005
21/07/2010 AR003
13/03/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents