pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Elder Care Volunteers
none
CC53705
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/08/2016
March 31

Address for service

9B Warborough Avenue
Epsom
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

(09) 524 6881
none


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To be beneficial to the community by improving the psychological well being of elders in care homes, through a reduction in loneliness due to the encouragement of companionship between volunteers and residents (elders); bridging the gap between young people and elders through connecting young volunteers with elders in care homes; relieving stress on families of loved ones in care homes by providing companionship when families are unable to visit; and advancing the education of young people by providing a volunteer opportunity that increases their ability to relate to elders.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Older people

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The organisation has a minimum of 3 members. There are currently 5 governing officers who form the management committee. Volunteers on the roster are ex officio members of the organisation unless they decline to be a member. Volunteers whose service has finished are associate members. The Volunteer Co-coordinator has overall strategic and operational responsibility for the roster, recruitment, training and management of volunteers and liaison with care homes.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 21/09/2020 $400 $291
30/09/2019 12/07/2019 $400 $0
30/09/2018 24/08/2018 $0 $0
30/09/2017 15/09/2017 $0 $0

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Derica Huang Committee Member 31/07/2016
Kristy Tsoi Committee Member 31/07/2016
Julie Goodyer Secretary/ Treasurer 24/05/2016
Christine Plank Administrative Officer 7/12/2015
Julia Plank Project Director 1/09/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/09/2020 NOC004

Charity Documents