pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Charity-IT
CC53452
9429043313372
Deregistered
30/03/2019

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Charity-IT at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

23/06/2016
March 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 30/03/2019 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 23/06/2016

Address for service

Flat 10
Dominion Building
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the trust is to: 2.1. Engage with, and facilitate connections and the transfer of value between, the information technology (IT) industry and the charitable not-for-profit community; 2.2. Enable charitable not-for-profit organisations to access IT knowledge, skills and assistance; 2.3. Enable IT professionals and organisations to use their IT knowledge and skills for charitable endeavours 2.4. Facilitate activities to deliver IT assistance to charitable organisations and groups 2.5. Promote activities consistent with its mission; 2.6. Provide other support and assistance consistent with its charitable purpose. [As written in the Charity-IT Trust Deed]

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Information Technology

Other charities

Entity Structure

Charity-IT’s structure consists of: Board of Trustees (governance + operational), and where on a project or running an event: a project team.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 1/08/2019 $500 $663
30/09/2017 9/04/2018 $3,034 $2,607

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ben Hughes board member 28/01/2016
Hannah Pearson-Coats board member 28/01/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lucy Mulvaney board member 1/07/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/07/2019 NOC005
22/01/2019 NOC004
28/07/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents