pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Volunteer Army Foundation
Student Volunteer Army
CC47611
9429043232000
Registered

Registration details

4/04/2012
March 31

Address for service

4 Ash Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

027 441 3927


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The SVA's purpose is to activate, support and inspire young people to mobilise as citizens and connect with their community through service and volunteering. Kia tūao, e tū ki te ao - Be a volunteer, stand up in the world.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Promotion of volunteering

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public

Entity Structure

SVA Foundation is a Charitable Trust that is governed by a Board of Trustees. SVA Clubs (typically but not always incorporated societies) can affiliate to the SVA Foundation for the usage of the "Student Volunteer Army" brand.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 25/09/2020 $586,354 $501,699
30/09/2019 7/10/2019 $104,136 $80,472
30/09/2018 4/10/2018 $89,746 $86,576
30/09/2017 20/02/2018 $77,968 $72,957
30/09/2016 19/01/2017 $261 $13,857
30/09/2015 29/05/2016 $70,305 $52,009
30/09/2014 16/02/2016 $126,484 $155,450
30/09/2013 25/08/2013 $481,129 $447,055

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Paul Reynolds Chairman 27/07/2020
Marianne Joan Dutkiewicz Trustee 15/02/2019
Peter Michael Holden Carr-Smith Treasurer 16/03/2018
Samuel Robert Johnson Chief Executive 27/09/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Leigh Harris Trustee 24/07/2020
Erin Victoria Jackson Chair 17/04/2020
William Lawson Osteen III Trustee 16/10/2019
Anthony Rohan Trustee 4/08/2017
Mark William Russell Trustee 23/11/2016
Raf Alfred Manji Trustee 31/03/2014
Christopher James Duncan Trustee 4/04/2012
Gina Scandrett Trustee 4/04/2012
Jade Rebecca Rutherford Trustee 4/04/2012
Samuel Rodney Gifford Trustee 4/04/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/04/2019 NOC016
7/03/2019 NOC015
7/03/2019 NOC014
10/09/2018 NOC012
20/08/2018 NOC011
16/07/2018 NOC010
19/03/2018 NOC009
11/09/2017 NOC007
17/02/2016 NOC004
5/12/2013 NOC003

Charity Documents